CA AB380 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 25547) to Chapter 6.95 of Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous materials.
Title
Spill response for railroads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Assembly - AB 380 DICKINSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB380 Dickinson By Hill (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 380 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB380 Dickinson By Hill (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 380 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6717.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6723.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 4832.). |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1739.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8670.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25547 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21083.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21092.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |