CA AB3254 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7602 and 7612.2 of, to amend and repeal Section 7612.11 of, to add Section 7613.11 to, and to add and repeal Section 7612.12 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cemeteries.
Title
Endowment care cemeteries: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7612.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7612.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7613.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |