CA AB2845 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 15 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 15 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 54446 to, and to add Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 54447) to Chapter 4 of Part 29 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to migrant education.
Title
Migrant education: California Mini-Corps program and currently migratory children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 54446 | New Code | See Bill Text |