CA AB2725 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10004.6, 10537, 10631, and 12929.22 of, and to add Section 27 to, the Water Code, relating to urban waterways.
Title
Urban waterway restoration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10004.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10537 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10631 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 12929.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2725&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2725_bill_20140221_introduced.html |