CA AB2616 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4663 of, and to add Section 3212.13 to, the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: hospital employers: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2616 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2616 Skinner By Hill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2616 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2616 Skinner By Hill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2616 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Insurance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 6325.). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4653.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5302.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 4663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |