CA AB2514 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 33440) to Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: dual language programs: grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2514 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2514 Thurmond et al. By Delgado (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2514 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2514 Thurmond et al. By Delgado (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2514 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 8. Page 6820.). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5699.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-06 | Senate | Measure version as amended on July 3 corrected. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 5430.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33440 | New Code | See Bill Text |