CA AB230 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 18900) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to youth athletic programs.
Title
Youth athletic programs: background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 AB230 Maienschein (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - AB 230 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - AB 230 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4257.). |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3621.) |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 14). |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 18900 | New Code | See Bill Text |