CA AB2017 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 530) to Division 1 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Banks and credit unions: nonsufficient funds fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2017 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 530 | New Code | See Bill Text |