CA AB1991 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Jun 10 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Jun 10 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 502 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Licensee and registrant records.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1991 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |