CA AB1738 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5910 and 5915 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: dispute resolution.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 1738 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1738 Chau By Jackson (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1738 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1738 Chau By Jackson (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1738 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 411, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6108.). |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4498.). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4946.) |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |