CA AB1581 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1602 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Diversion or obstruction of rivers, streams, or lakes: lake or streambed alteration agreement.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1581 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2050.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |