CA AB1511 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13300 of, and to add Section 11105.07 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal history information.
Title
Criminal history information: animal control officers.
Sponsors
Asm. Beth Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 1511 GAINES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1511 Beth Gaines By Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1511 GAINES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1511 Beth Gaines By Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1511 GAINES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6039.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4410.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4470.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 11). |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 14. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11105.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |