CA AB1459 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 39900) of Part 2 of Division 26 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to state government.
Title
The Atmospheric Acidity Protection Act of 1988.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-09 - Assembly - AB 1459 HUBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1459 Huber (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1459 HUBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1459 Huber (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1459 HUBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m. | |
2012-08-09 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5838.). | |
2012-08-06 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-07-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4317.). | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-18 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-04-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4568.) | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18). | |
2012-03-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-01-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. | |
2012-01-09 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39900 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |