CA AB1459 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50675.1 and 50675.14 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Multifamily Housing Program: veterans.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-17 - Assembly - AB 1459 DAVIS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #13 AB1459 Davis (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1459 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #13 AB1459 Davis (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1459 DAVIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-08 | Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. | |
2009-08-24 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2009-08-17 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1459.) | |
2009-07-16 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-07-16 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1767.) | |
2009-07-09 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-06 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-17 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-06-11 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-10 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-06-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1234.) | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |