CA AB1373 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5406 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: firefighters and peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1373 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1373 John A. P (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1373 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1373 John A. P (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1373 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 3084.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2251.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2013-08-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 1220.) |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 24). |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 5406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |