CA AB1271 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 794, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 794, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32282.1 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety plans: pupil mental health care.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1271 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1271 Bonta By Lara (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1271 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Higher Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1271 Bonta By Lara (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1271 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Higher Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 794, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6533.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6379.) |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4709.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3720.) |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32282.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84810.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 14030 | New Code | See Bill Text |