AZ SB1115 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Direct pay prices; health care
Title
Direct pay prices; health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Governor Vetoed | |
2013-04-08 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0) |
2013-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |