AZ HB2704 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Foster youth permanency project team
Title
Foster youth permanency project team
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gress [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-8-3-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Children - Title 8
Confidentiality
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Foster Youth Permanency Project Team
Confidentiality
Dcs (see Also: Department Of Child Safety)
Department Of Child Safety (dcs)
Foster Youth Permanency Project Team