AZ HB2698 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Declarant control; planned communities
Title
Declarant control; planned communities
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 124 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | House | House RA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |