AZ HB2646 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Failed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Failed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; home buyers; grants; appropriation
Title
Veterans; home buyers; grants; appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: Withdrawn |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |