AZ HB2546 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; guaranty fund
Title
Insurance; guaranty fund
Sponsors
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Rep. Phil Lovas [R] | Rep. Debbie McCune-Davis [D] |
Sen. Juan Mendez [D] | Rep. Ethan Orr [R] | Sen. Victoria Steele [D] | Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-0-6-0) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | House IR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to House IR Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-07 | House | Assigned to House IR Committee |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |