AZ HB2412 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-02-26 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Firearms; schools; safety designee program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; schools; safety designee program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-26HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-1-0)
2014-02-25HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2014-02-25HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Withdrawn
2014-02-18HouseReferred to House JUD Committee
2014-02-18HouseHouse read second time
2014-02-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-02-25HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2014-02-17HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2014-02-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback