AZ HB2333 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; K-12 rollover
Title
Appropriation; K-12 rollover
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | House | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |