AZ HB2305 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Compact; balanced budget; convention
Title
Compact; balanced budget; convention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Federalism and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-4-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-2-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | House FFR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House FFR Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House FFR Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |