AZ HB2305 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Initiatives; filings; circulators
Title
Initiatives; filings; circulators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-13 | House | House final reading , voting: (33-26-1-0) |
2013-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-20 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-5-2-0) |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |