AR HB1710 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Uniform Act Regulating Traffic On Highways Of Arkansas; And To Amend The Law Regarding Overtaking A Bicycle.
Title
To Amend The Uniform Act Regulating Traffic On Highways Of Arkansas; And To Amend The Law Regarding Overtaking A Bicycle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 43 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-03-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |