AL SB97 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing, Board of, anti-competitive rule making, immunity provided, Sec. 34-21-2.1 added
Title
Nursing, Board of, anti-competitive rule making, immunity provided, Sec. 34-21-2.1 added
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 854 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 853 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Health and Human Services first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |