AL SB420 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pike Road, ad valorem tax, additional authorized for public schools, referendum
Title
Pike Road, ad valorem tax, additional authorized for public schools, referendum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-24 | Brewbaker motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |