AL HB60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses, crimes of abuse and neglect of an adult with a disability in the first, second and third degree and crimes of financial exploitation of an adult with a disability in the first, second, and third degree, created
Title
Crimes and offenses, crimes of abuse and neglect of an adult with a disability in the first, second and third degree and crimes of financial exploitation of an adult with a disability in the first, second, and third degree, created
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Boyd substitution KI7T55U-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Boyd substitution KI7T55U-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 2nd Judiciary Amendment Adopted F3YW55D-1 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 1st Judiciary Amendment Adopted NQKCJTJ-1 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 260 |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 259 KI7T55U-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Children and Senior Advocacy 1st Substitute Offered KI7T55U-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted KI7T55U-1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Children and Senior Advocacy |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Children and Senior Advocacy |
2024-01-30 | House | Prefiled |