AL HB57 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Department, health organizations, included in risk-based capital regulation, risk retention groups included in definition of insurers, risk retention acts, financial statements filed with commissioner, code of ethics, Secs. 27-2B-14.1, 27-31A-3.1 added; Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 22-21-374, 27-21A-23, 27-2B-2, 27-2B-3, 27-2B-4, 27-2B-7, 27-2B-10, 27-6B-2, 27-6B-4 am'd.; 27-31A-3 added
Title
Insurance Department, health organizations, included in risk-based capital regulation, risk retention groups included in definition of insurers, risk retention acts, financial statements filed with commissioner, code of ethics, Secs. 27-2B-14.1, 27-31A-3.1 added; Secs. 10A-20-6.16, 22-21-374, 27-21A-23, 27-2B-2, 27-2B-3, 27-2B-4, 27-2B-7, 27-2B-10, 27-6B-2, 27-6B-4 am'd.; 27-31A-3 added
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Banking and Insurance |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 127 |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |