AL HB287 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery County, Montgomery City/County Personnel Board and Department, abolished, new personnel merit system provided separately for city and county employees, separate appeals board and rules.
Title
Montgomery County, Montgomery City/County Personnel Board and Department, abolished, new personnel merit system provided separately for city and county employees, separate appeals board and rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 974 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Instrument Change 8XGLHHH-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 91 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 87 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Instrument Change 8XGLHHH-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 91 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-02 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 974 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-03-21 | House | Engrossed |
2024-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 277 |
2024-03-21 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 276 8XGLHHH-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Montgomery County Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered 8XGLHHH-1 |
2024-03-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-19 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Montgomery County Legislation 8XGLHHH-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Montgomery County Legislation 1st Amendment USJIGXG-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Pending House Montgomery County Legislation |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Montgomery County Legislation |