AL HB251 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public K-12 schools, to prohibit certain actions toward military children and membership in athletic associations that do the same
Title
Public K-12 schools, to prohibit certain actions toward military children and membership in athletic associations that do the same
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 537 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 536 NAFZJJ8-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 536 NAFZJJ8-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-04-11 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 537 |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 536 NAFZJJ8-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Education Policy Engrossed Substitute Offered NAFZJJ8-1 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Education Policy NAFZJJ8-1 |
2024-04-03 | House | Education Policy 1st Amendment HTTA833-1 |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Education Policy |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SB206 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar