AL HB233 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Waggoner motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Waggoner motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health, delegation of specific medical procedures and training of certain school personnel relating to medical needs of students, limit liability of public schools and certain school personnel, Alabama Safe at Schools Act
Title
Health, delegation of specific medical procedures and training of certain school personnel relating to medical needs of students, limit liability of public schools and certain school personnel, Alabama Safe at Schools Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2014-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-19 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 891 |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 890 |
2014-03-19 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 889 |
2014-03-19 | House | Health first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |