AL HB230 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic and Foreign Corporations; annual report requirement removed
Title
Domestic and Foreign Corporations; annual report requirement removed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 739 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Underwood amendment L8GUWYW-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Instrument Change C459QQW-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Underwood amendment L8GUWYW-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Instrument Change C459QQW-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-26 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 739 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 234 |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 233 L8GUWYW-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Underwood 1st Amendment Offered L8GUWYW-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 232 C459QQW-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | State Government Engrossed Substitute Offered C459QQW-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted C459QQW-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted DK1KTTH-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House State Government |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB204 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar