AK SJR14 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Support State Seafood Industry
Title
Support State Seafood Industry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.FIN) |
2024-03-20 | House | AM: CARPENTER, STUTES |
2024-03-20 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK, MCCABE, VANCE |
2024-03-20 | House | PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR |
2024-03-20 | House | FSH RPT HCS(FSH) NEW TITLE 5DP 2AM |
2024-03-06 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT |
2024-03-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STUTES |
2024-03-01 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, ARMSTRONG, HANNAN |
2024-03-01 | House | FSH |
2024-03-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-02-28 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 14 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | PASSED Y19 E1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 14 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI |
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/28 CAL |
2024-02-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-02-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.FIN) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-02-26 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, TOBIN, SHOWER, WILSON, GRAY-JACKSON, OLSON, HUGHES, KAUFMAN |
2024-02-19 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR, MERRICK |
2024-02-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN, CLAMAN, HOFFMAN, GIESSEL, STEVENS |
2024-02-15 | Senate | FIN |
2024-02-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Agriculture
Boats & Boating
Business
Consumer Affairs
Economic Development
Economy
Federal Aid
Fish & Game (fish)
Food
Funds
Grants
Intergovernmental Relations
Sales
Taxation
Trade Practices
Vessels
Water
Boats & Boating
Business
Consumer Affairs
Economic Development
Economy
Federal Aid
Fish & Game (fish)
Food
Funds
Grants
Intergovernmental Relations
Sales
Taxation
Trade Practices
Vessels
Water