AK SB259 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the compensation of state employees; relating to the salary of the chief administrative law judge; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Compensation For Certain State Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-04-26 | House | FIN |
2024-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 259(FIN) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y19 A1 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 259(FIN) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL |
2024-04-22 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2024-04-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FN1: (GOV/VARIOUS) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | NR: WILSON, MERRICK |
2024-04-19 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, KIEHL, BISHOP |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2024-03-06 | Senate | FIN |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |