AK SB206 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to workers' compensation reemployment benefits; establishing a workers' compensation stay-at-work program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Workers' Comp. Stay-at-work Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-24 | Senate | FN1: (LWF) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP |
2024-04-24 | Senate | DP: OLSON, KIEHL |
2024-04-24 | Senate | FIN RPT 2DP 4NR |
2024-02-26 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR |
2024-02-23 | Senate | FN1: (LWF) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | NR: MERRICK |
2024-02-23 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON |
2024-02-23 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR |
2024-01-24 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN |
2024-01-24 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2024-01-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Claims
Death
Disabilities
Employment
Hearings
Labor
Physicians
Rights
Workers Compensation
Claims
Death
Disabilities
Employment
Hearings
Labor
Physicians
Rights
Workers Compensation
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=SB206 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0206A.PDF |