AK HB329 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to state tideland leases; and relating to aquatic farming or related hatchery operation site leases.
Title
Aquatic Farm And Hatchery Leases
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Vance [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-26 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2024-04-18 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2024-04-18 | House | NR: MEARS, DIBERT, SADDLER, WRIGHT |
2024-04-18 | House | DP: MCCABE, BAKER, RAUSCHER, MCKAY |
2024-04-18 | House | RES RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 4DP 4NR |
2024-03-28 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2024-03-28 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2024-03-28 | House | DP: C.JOHNSON, HIMSCHOOT, CARPENTER, STUTES, MCCABE, VANCE |
2024-03-28 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 6DP |
2024-02-15 | House | FSH, RES |
2024-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB329 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0329A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0329B.PDF |