WY SF0018 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 164 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 164 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; providing for the expungement of records of conviction of misdemeanors as specified; repealing related provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Expungement of misdemeanors.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0018JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0018JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0018JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0018JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-19-11-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-19-11-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0 (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0018JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0018JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0018JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-19-11-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-19-11-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0 (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 164 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0063 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0063 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0063 |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0063 | |
2015-03-03 | House | Adopted SF0018JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Adopted SF0018JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-19-11-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-19 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-5-1-0-0 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-21 | Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-22 | Bill Number Assigned |