WY SF0015 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to juveniles; amending provisions relating to children in need of supervision; providing for diverting children from judicial proceedings; providing for limited representation by guardian ad litem; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Children in need of supervision-2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-17 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/SF0015.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/SF0015.pdf |