WY SF0002 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to K-12 school facilities; amending provisions governing school facility adequacy standards; amending provisions governing school facility needs assessments; amending provisions governing the prioritization of remedies for school facilities by the school facilities commission; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School facilities-project prioritization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 131 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0058 | |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0058 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0058 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0058 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-03 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-11 | Bill Number Assigned |