WY SF0002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - S: DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - S: DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to liquor licenses; increasing the number of bar and grill licenses available; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bar and grill liquor licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | S: DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-23 | Rerefer to S08 - Transportation | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/SF0002.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/SF0002.pdf |