WY HJ0001 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to enact legislation and requesting that the Veteran's Administration work to expand and improve efforts to treat traumatic brain injuries and post-traumatic stress disorder.
Title
Traumatic brain injury and post traumatic stress treatments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - Concur:Passed 54-3-3-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001 | |
2021-02-05 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2021-02-05 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2021-02-05 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001 | |
2021-02-05 | House | Concur:Passed 54-3-3-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-02-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-02-02 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-3-0-0-0 |
2021-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-01-27 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-23 | Bill Number Assigned |