WY HB0097 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; providing that no abortion shall be performed after the embryo or fetus has a detectable fetal heartbeat; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

No abortion after heartbeat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26HouseCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2013-02-04HouseIntroduced and referred to H10; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10
2013-01-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback