WY HB0085 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - (H) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - (H) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental studies; providing for a task force to study governmental continuity in case of a disruption in federal government operations; providing for a report; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Government continuity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - H Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H07 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | (H) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-22 | (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (H07) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H07 | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0085.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/HB0085.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0085.htm |