WY HB0070 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - (H) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - (H) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to firearms; prohibiting the carrying of firearms into specified buildings; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Court Security Act of 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - H Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H01 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | (H) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-20 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-16 | (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0070.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/HB0070.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/HB0070.htm |