WY HB0030 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; prohibiting the use of drones to harass or hunt wildlife as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Prohibited harassment of wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - H Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 26 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H06 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H06 (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2014-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0030.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0030.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0030.htm |