WY HB0007 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-2-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-2-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for rules and regulations to authorize the collection of road killed animals; providing restrictions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game road kill.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Ruth Petroff [R] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-2- (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-2-1-0-0 | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 |
2015-01-20 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-19 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-16 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |