WV SB790 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changing reference to Curator of Department of Arts, Culture, and History to Cabinet Secretary
Title
Changing reference to Curator of Department of Arts, Culture, and History to Cabinet Secretary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 213) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 212) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 130) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 212) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 130) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 145, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | House | Approved by Governor 2/28/2024 - House Journal |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-23 | House | To Governor 2/22/2024 - House Journal |
2024-02-22 | Senate | To Governor 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-02-19 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-19 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 213) |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 212) |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Reference dispensed |
2024-02-15 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 131) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 131) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 130) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB5590 (Similar To) 2024-02-16 - On 1st reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 1 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |