WV SB694 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 121, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 121, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to oil and gas conservation
Title
Relating to oil and gas conservation
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 401) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 461) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 429) (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 230) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 229) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 461) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 429) (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 230) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 229) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 121, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 401) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Title amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 461) |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-08 | House | Amendment to amendment rejected (Roll No. 429) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/8/22 |
2022-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2022-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | House | To House Energy and Manufacturing |
2022-03-01 | House | To Energy and Manufacturing then Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 230) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 229) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22C | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22C | 9 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |